18 June 2021
CentralNic Group plc
("CentralNic" or the "Company", or the "Group")
Board Appointments
CentralNic Group plc (AIM: CNIC), the global internet platform that derives revenue from the subscription sales of domain names and web services, announces the appointment to its board of Matthew Max Edward Royde ("Max Royde") and Horst Oskar Siffrin as Non-executive Directors with immediate effect. Max and Horst are joining the board as shareholder representatives of Kestrel Partners LLP and inter.services GmbH respectively.
Max Royde is currently managing partner at Kestrel Partners, an investment management company specialising in business-critical software companies, which has a beneficial holding in CentralNic of 56,583,670 shares or 22.53%. Max co-founded Kestrel Partners in 2009 and is a fund manager of Kestrel Opportunities. Prior to Kestrel Max was a managing director of KBC Peel Hunt, running its technology franchise. He has over 20 years' experience focusing on the technology sector.
Horst Siffrin started his career as a German diplomat serving in Germany, the UK, Ethiopia, Nigeria, Bolivia, Poland and Spain. He is partner of inter.services holding/investments, which has a beneficial holding in the Company of 37,085,870 shares or 14.77% and owner of H.O. Siffrin Consulting based in Berlin. From August 2011 until the reverse takeover of CentralNic in August 2018 he was Chairman of the Supervisory Board of KeyDrive SA, Luxemburg and member of the Advisory Board of the Key-Systems Group. In 2018 he co-founded AstraPharma.
Ben Crawford, CEO of CentralNic commented: "We are delighted to welcome Max to our board. Through Kestrel Partners he has been a long-term investor and supporter of CentralNic. He has extensive experience of UK listed technology companies and capital markets and his knowledge will be invaluable to us as we continue to grow the Company.
We also welcome Horst onto our board. Having held senior positions at our 2018 acquisition KeyDrive, Horst understands both our industry and our business and we look forward to his support in taking CentralNic to the next stage in its growth."
The following disclosures are made in relation to paragraph (g) of Schedule Two of the AIM Rules for Companies:
Matthew Max Edward Royde (age 49)
Current Directorships | Past Directorships within the last 5 years |
Kestrel Partners LLP | Kestrel Investment Partners LLP |
Elms Road Capital Limited | Ingenta plc |
Charles Connell & Company Holdings Limited | IDE Group Holdings plc |
Track Record Holdings Limited | Gresham Technologies Plc |
Trailight Ltd |
|
Findlay Park Partners LLP |
|
IQGeo Group plc |
|
Max Royde was appointed as a director of Hotel Buyer Limited on 10 October 2000 and resigned on 10 May 2005. On 31 May 2005, the company passed an extraordinary resolution to put the company into creditors voluntary liquidation. The company was dissolved on 26 January 2008.
Horst Oskar Siffrin (age 73)
Current Directorships | Past Directorships within the last 5 years |
inter.services GmbH | KeyDrive SA |
H.O. Siffrin Consulting |
|
AstraPharma GmbH |
|
IIG - Invest in Growth GmbH |
|
PerspektiveAfrika E.V |
|
Seniorenhilfe.Saarland E.V |
|
phi GmbH |
|
Gastehaus Residenz Aurora - Horst Siffrin e.K |
|
-Ends-
For further information:
CentralNic Group Plc Ben Crawford, Chief Executive Officer Don Baladasan, Group Managing Director Michael Riedl, Chief Financial Officer
| +44 (0) 203 388 0600 |
Zeus Capital Limited (NOMAD and Joint Broker) Nick Cowles / Jamie Peel (Corporate Finance) John Goold / Rupert Woolfenden (Institutional Sales)
|
+44 (0) 161 831 1512 +44 (0) 203 829 5000 |
Stifel (Joint Broker) Fred Walsh / Alex Price / Richard Short | +44 (0) 20 7710 7600
|
SEC Newgate (for Media) Bob Huxford / Tom Carnegie / Isabelle Smurfit | +44 (0) 203 757 6880 centralnic@secnewgate.co.uk
|
About CentralNic Group plc
CentralNic (AIM: CNIC) is a London-based AIM-listed company which drives the growth of the global digital economy by developing and managing software platforms allows businesses globally to buy subscriptions to domain names for websites and email, monetise domain names, and protect their brands online. Its core growth strategy is identifying and acquiring cash-generative businesses in its industry with annuity revenue streams and exposure to growth markets and migrating them onto the CentralNic software and operating platforms.
CentralNic operates globally with customers in almost every country in the world. It earns recurring revenues from the worldwide sales of internet domain names and other services on an annual subscription basis.
For more information please visit: www.centralnicgroup.com
RNS may use your IP address to confirm compliance with the terms and conditions, to analyse how you engage with the information contained in this communication, and to share such analysis on an anonymised basis with others as part of our commercial services. For further information about how RNS and the London Stock Exchange use the personal data you provide us, please see our Privacy Policy.